Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lohse, Nicole Renee, against Fitzwater, Leela, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2010 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time410 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
January 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
February 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.