Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
A&A Ready Mixed Concrete Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Devirian & Shinmoto, against White Day Hollow Organic Farmsllc, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management132 days |
Filing DateJune 22, 2010 |
Category(26) Limited Other Real Property - 10,000 -25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions147 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time147 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
March 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
November 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.