Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gordon & Wong, against Donaldson, Jennifer A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2008 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions399 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time399 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2012 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
March 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Address Change | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
April 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
February 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - In Part | |
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Conversion Close |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.