Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Legal Recovery Law Offices, against Patterson, Dorthy, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2007 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions244 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time244 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
August 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Not Satisfied | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Address Change | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.