Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Fsb, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Neill, Paula J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2006 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time68 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
May 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
November 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Satisfied | |
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Determining Claim of Exemption | |
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Claim of Exemption
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 12, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Determining Claim of Exemption | |
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Hearing On Claim of Exemption Post Judgement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.