Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Erin Capital Management Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Eltman & Cooper, against Damn, Cory, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management117 days |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2006 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time120 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Satisfied | |
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
August 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.