Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Palisades Collection Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Wolpoff & Abramson, against Gonzales, Victoria, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Michael A. Jacques presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A. Jacques Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2005 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time4606 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
August 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
August 11, 2006 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
June 21, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Order | |
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Jacques, Michael A |
|
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Jacques, Michael A |
|
June 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.