Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beneficial California Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zide, Flint C, against Cruff, Ralph, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2004 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time78 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
|
April 04, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Pre-Judgment) | |
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
March 21, 2005 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court | |
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
February 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event | Dismiss Without Prejudice | |
February 23, 2005 | Docket Event | Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.