Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
California Service Bureau Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sipes, Michael K, against Judd, Lynn Ellen, Judd, Steve Marty, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Debra L. Givens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra L. Givens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management125 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2004 |
Category(37) Limited Other Contract - 10,000 - 25,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions48 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time48 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Bankruptcy filed (Pre-Judgment) | |
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Acknowledgement of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
November 13, 2006 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Not Satisfied | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Issued | |
July 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
June 19, 2006 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Givens, Debra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.