Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sutter County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Addington, Jeffery Davis, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 1999 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
July 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support | |
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.