Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Walter, Bonnie Lou, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 1998 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
January 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice to Dismiss on Court's Motion | |
October 09, 2000 | Docket Event | File at Annex | |
December 11, 1998 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
December 11, 1998 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
December 04, 1998 | Docket Event | Add Pre-JBSIS Case (conversion) | |
December 04, 1998 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.