Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Stevens, Francis Gary, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 1994 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
October 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
September 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
September 01, 2006 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
August 18, 2006 | Docket Event | OSC re Contempt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.