Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Luckie, Steven R, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
April 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Application and Order | |
April 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
March 19, 2004 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Reissuance
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
January 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
January 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
January 02, 2004 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Reissuance | |
November 03, 2003 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
November 03, 2003 | Docket Event | Application and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.