Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Ross, Paul Edward, represented by Smith, Brenda C, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 23, 1991 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Shasta Collection - Odyssey | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | File Returned From... | |
November 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
Application and Order for Reissuance
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Calendar/Commitment Form | |
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Warrant
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
September 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Reissuance | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.