Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Luther, Todd, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Purged | |
May 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Issued - Civil | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Ordered | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Review Hearing Family Law | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Warrant Ordered Stayed/Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.