Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Webb, Ronald James, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 1985 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | File Returned From... | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
April 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
April 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Bench Warrant Ordered | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.