Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fisher, Lynda Kathleen, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Fisher, Robert Lee, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1984 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS | |
February 09, 2006 | Docket Event | FL Settlement Conference | |
August 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Unspecified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.