Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baker, Karen Dianne, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Baker, Harvey Lee, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 1981 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event | File Returned From... | |
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
December 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
October 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
October 24, 2005 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
October 19, 2005 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
October 17, 2005 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Order | |
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support | |
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
October 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Consolidated |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.