Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Bowling, Leonard, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 1981 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 11, 2008 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
July 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
June 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS | |
May 08, 2008 | Docket Event | FL Settlement Conference | |
January 20, 1983 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
December 01, 1981 | Docket Event | Register of Actions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.