Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Yuba, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Storm, Amelia, represented by Scarfe, Ami, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 09, 2019 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time191 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Entry of Judgment/ Proof by Mail | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter Submitted | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.