Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yuba, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Mello, Faron J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2018 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time565 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Gov - Notice of Motion | |
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Returning Docs Annex | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.