Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yuba, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Zambrano-Flores, Jennifer Ann, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2018 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time92 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Entry of Judgment/ Proof by Mail | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Request to Enter Default Judgment | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Declaration for Default/Uncontested Judgment | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.