Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yuba, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Hernandez, Arturo T, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time69 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Returning Docs Annex | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Entry of Judgment/ Proof by Mail | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Request to Enter Default Judgment | |
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Declaration for Default/Uncontested Judgment | |
February 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.