Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Hennessey, Melissa J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions105 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time105 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.