Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Bordenkircher, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2015 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions131 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time131 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Enforcement
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.