Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Nieto, Craig A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2014 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions65 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time65 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Substituted Payee | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support | |
May 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
April 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
April 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Governmental - Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.