Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sacramento County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Yates, Sherryl A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time229 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 22, 2015 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
April 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.