Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sutter County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Thompson, Donley L, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2014 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time749 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
September 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
August 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Gov - Notice of Motion for Judicial Review of License Denial | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion For Judicial Review of License Denial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.