Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sutter County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Denison, Robert S, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2014 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time1513 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Change Responsibility Managing Support | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support | |
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
October 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
October 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Consolidated | |
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Gov - Notice of Motion | |
August 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.