Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sutter County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Webb, Lawrence Lane, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time289 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
August 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
August 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support | |
August 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Substituted Payee | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Entry of Judgment/ Proof by Mail | |
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
September 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event | FL Settlement Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.