Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butte County Superior Court, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Gonzalez, Ronnie G, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2010 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time107 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
October 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
September 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
September 03, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS | |
July 14, 2010 | Docket Event | FL Settlement Conference | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
June 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.