Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Thomason, Jennifer K, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2009 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions132 days |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time132 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Entry of Judgment/ Proof by Mail | |
April 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | FL Settlement Conference | |
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion For Judgement or Modify: Support &/OR Health Care | |
February 08, 2010 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.