Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
El Dorado County Court, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Jenkins, Eric Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time5119 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice RE Payment of Support | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
November 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS | |
August 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Governmental - Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.