Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sutter County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Murillo, Daniel Markley, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2004 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time5459 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
February 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Custody Order | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
April 02, 2008 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
December 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Governmental - Response to Notice Motion/Order to Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.