Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sacramento County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Davis, Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2004 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time321 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Governmental - Order After Hearing | |
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
December 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.