Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sutter County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Hernandez, Andrew A, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2003 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time210 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Registration CA Support (Outgoing) | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Governmental - Notice Change Responsibility Managing Support | |
November 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Unspecified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.