Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sacramento County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Dcss Attorney Yuba County, against Flores, Gary J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2003 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time6075 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Warrant Returned/Filed | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant Returned/Filed | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Orders Warrant Recalled/Set Aside | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued | |
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause re Contempt
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.