Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rocha, Nicholas L, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Larscheid Buchanan& Zeff, against Rocha, Jeri N, represented by Sager, Laurence J, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with James L. Curry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames L. Curry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2003 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time5825 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
April 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
June 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Continued Order To Show Cause | |
May 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Continued Order To Show Cause | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.