Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Yuba County, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Yuba County, against Roof, Frank Jason, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 10, 2001 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time6484 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Electronic File as of this date | |
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | File Imaged/Destroyed | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
August 28, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Governmental - Stipulation and Order | |
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Unspecified |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.