Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Collins, Joel, Jr., filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Hort, Kayla, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte on Court's Own Motion
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Report to Court Collection Division | |
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Paid In Full | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Payment Arrangements Made |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.