Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dalton, Tesla R, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Langsfeld, Austin M, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Declaration/Memorandum | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter Returned | |
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.