Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dobbins, Amanda, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Kerns, Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Wirtschafter, Benjamin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWirtschafter, Benjamin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time227 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Order RE FTA/Complete Court Ordered CCRC | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | FL Order Re: FTA At Orientation/Mediation To Judge | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
February 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Report to Court Collection Division | |
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Order $85 | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.