Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hill, Gail, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hill Sr, William, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 1993 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Calendar
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice to Dismiss on Court's Motion 5-Year | |
February 09, 2004 | Docket Event | Custody Order | |
March 22, 1994 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
March 11, 1994 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
March 11, 1994 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
March 07, 1994 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.