Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hoskin, Norman, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hoskin, Donna Hoskin, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 1993 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
January 09, 2008 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
December 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Governmental - Stipulation and Order | |
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS | |
October 25, 2007 | Docket Event | FL Settlement Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.