Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Leblanc, Sylvia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Leblanc, Alfred, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 1993 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
July 01, 2005 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Evans, Timothy J |
|
June 20, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 08, 2005 | Docket Event | Review Hearing Family Law | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Curry, James L |
|
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
March 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.