Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis J. Buckley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
October 25, 1994 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
June 14, 1994 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
February 01, 1994 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 28, 1994 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 23, 1993 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
December 13, 1993 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Buckley, Dennis J |
|
December 13, 1993 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (conversion) | |
December 02, 1993 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
November 30, 1993 | Docket Event | Review Hearing Family Law |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.