Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thompson, Kirk D., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thompson, Paulette S., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with David E. Wasilenko presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Wasilenko Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
March 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
July 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Evans, Timothy J |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Evans, Timothy J |
|
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Evans, Timothy J |
|
March 28, 2005 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.