Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jones, Vicki Arlene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Jones, Randal Duane, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 1991 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Order Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 15, 2015 | Docket Event | File Returned From... | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
June 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
June 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Governmental - Stipulation and Order | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration RE Address Verif - Post Jdgmt Required to Modify | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration | |
May 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.