Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Troutfetter, Bill R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Troutfetter, Jacqueline T, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 1991 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Unspecified | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Application and Order | |
June 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause | |
January 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.