Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeUmanzio, Dennis A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 1983 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event | File Returned From... | |
August 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
August 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Order of Examination
Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A |
|
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Family Support Filed By DCSS | |
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Application and Order | |
April 03, 2000 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment | |
March 01, 1996 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous (conversion) | |
February 24, 1983 | Docket Event | Conversion Close |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.